GA HB1062 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-18 - Effective Date 2022-04-18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-18 - Effective Date 2022-04-18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide a homestead exemption from Upson County ad valorem taxes for county purposes in the amount of $24,000.00 of the assessed value of the homestead for residents of that county who are 65 years of age or older and disabled; to provide for definitions; to specify the terms and conditions of the exemption and the procedures relating thereto; to provide for applicability; to provide for compliance with constitutional requirements; to provide for related matters; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Upson County; ad valorem tax for county purposes; provide homestead exemption
Sponsors
Rep. Beth Camp [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #730 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #761 (Y: 125 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - Reconsider: House Vote #487 (Y: 101 N: 51 NV: 8 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #475 (Y: 104 N: 61 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #761 (Y: 125 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - Reconsider: House Vote #487 (Y: 101 N: 51 NV: 8 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #475 (Y: 104 N: 61 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-18 | Effective Date 2022-04-18 | |
2022-04-18 | Act 618 | |
2022-04-18 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-07 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2022-02-07 | House | House Reconsidered |
2022-02-03 | House | House Notice to Reconsider |
2022-02-03 | House | House Third Reading Lost |
2022-02-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-02 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-01 | House | House First Readers |
2022-01-27 | House | House Hopper |