GA HB1058 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act changing the method of selecting the members of the Board of Education of Miller County, approved March 21, 1968 (Ga. L. 1968, p. 2529), as amended, particularly by an Act approved March 20, 2000 (Ga. L. 2000, p. 3534), so as to revise the districts for the election of members of the board of education; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for method of election; to provide for the continuation in office of current members; to repeal and reserve certain provisions; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Miller County; Board of Education; revise districts for election of members

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #692 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Vote #731 (Y: 156 N: 1 NV: 16 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-01 Effective Date
2018-05-08 Act 525
2018-05-08HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-04HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-03-27SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2018-03-27SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-03-23SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-03-21HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2018-03-21HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-03-21HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2018-03-19HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-03-15HouseHouse First Readers
2018-03-14HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback