GA HB1053 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the imposition, rate, computation, exemptions, and credits for state income tax, so as to extend a tax credit for certain expenditures made by postproduction companies; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Income tax; certain expenditures made by postproduction companies; extend tax credit
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Kasey Carpenter [R] | Rep. Lynn Smith [R] | Rep. Randy Nix [R] |
Rep. Mike Cheokas [R] | Rep. Carl Gilliard [D] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - House - Agree To Senate Sub As Am: House Vote #877 (Y: 132 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #736 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Hb 586, Hb 1053, Hb 302: Senate Vote #731 (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - Passage: House Vote #692 (Y: 140 N: 25 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #736 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Hb 586, Hb 1053, Hb 302: Senate Vote #731 (Y: 29 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - Passage: House Vote #692 (Y: 140 N: 25 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-15 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-15 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-02-08 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2022-02-08 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2022-02-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-01-27 | House | House First Readers |
2022-01-26 | House | House Hopper |