GA HB1050 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Act 405
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 38 of Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to Georgia Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association, so as to extend association protections to certain persons receiving insurance coverage from health maintenance organization subscriber contracts or health care corporation plans; to provide for applicability; to provide for modernization and updates; to provide for revisions to the assessment formula on long-term care insurance written by impaired or insolvent insurers; to provide for the recoupment of assessments on certain members through a surcharge on premiums as approved by the Commissioner; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Georgia Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association; certain persons receiving insurance coverage from health maintenance organization subscriber contracts or health care corporation plans; extend association protections

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #692 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #636 (Y: 155 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 18) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30 Act 405
2020-06-30HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2020-06-29HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2020-06-22SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2020-06-22SenateSenate Third Read
2020-06-20SenateSenate Read Second Time
2020-06-19SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2020-06-15SenateSenate Withdrawn & Recommitted
2020-03-13SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-03-12HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2020-03-12HouseHouse Third Readers
2020-03-04HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2020-02-28HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-02-27HouseHouse First Readers
2020-02-26HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback