GA HB1049 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 27 of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to nursing home administrators, so as to revise the composition of the State Board of Nursing Home Administrators; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State Board of Nursing Home Administrators; revise composition
Sponsors
Rep. John LaHood [R] | Rep. Jesse Petrea [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Bonnie Rich [R] |
Sen. Billy Hickman [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #695 (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - Passage: House Vote #502 (Y: 159 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - Passage: House Vote #502 (Y: 159 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Effective Date 2022-07-01 | |
2022-05-02 | Act 816 | |
2022-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-10 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-10 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-02 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-01-27 | House | House First Readers |
2022-01-26 | House | House Hopper |