GA HB1048 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the Forsyth County Board of Registrations and Elections, approved March 31, 1987 (Ga. L. 1987, p. 5381), as amended, so as to increase the membership of the board; to provide for the appointment and terms of the additional members; to provide for compensation; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Forsyth County; Board of Registrations and Elections; increase membership

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #564 (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House Vote #577 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-10 Effective Date
2014-04-10 Act 415
2014-04-10HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2014-03-25HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2014-03-04SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2014-03-04SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2014-02-26SenateSenate Read and Referred
2014-02-25HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2014-02-25HouseHouse Third Readers
2014-02-25HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2014-02-24HouseHouse Second Readers
2014-02-21HouseHouse First Readers
2014-02-20HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback