GA HB1044 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-08 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-08 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 10 of Title 13 of the O.C.G.A., relating to contracts for public works, so as to increase the dollar value of certain public works contracts exempt from provisions relating to retention of contractual payments; to amend Article 10 of Chapter 2 of Title 20, relating to contracts and purchases by public schools, so as to increase the dollar value trigger of certain considerations related to in-state purchasing preferences for certain contracts and purchases; to amend Article 11 of Chapter 2 of Title 20, relating to public school property and facilities, so as to increase the dollar value related to when certain school construction contracts must be subject to competitive bidding; to amend Chapter 91 of Title 36 of the O.C.G.A., relating to public works bidding; to amend Part 1 of Article 3 of Chapter 5 of Title 50, relating to general authority, duties, and procedure for state purchasing; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Contracts; increase dollar value of certain public works contracts exempt from provisions relating to retention of contractual payments
Sponsors
Rep. Victor Anderson [R] | Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] | Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] | Rep. Bill Yearta [R] |
Rep. Rob Leverett [R] | Rep. J Collins [R] | Sen. Sam Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-12 - House - Passage: House Vote #468 (Y: 154 N: 8 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-12 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-02-12 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-01-29 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-01-26 | House | House First Readers |
2024-01-25 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/66337 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/221908 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/66337#22869 |