GA HB1043 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating a new charter for the City of Jesup, approved December 16, 1937 (Ga. L. 1937-38 Ex. Sess., p. 1142), as amended, so as to provide for staggered terms for the board of commissioners; to provide for the conduct of municipal elections; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Jesup, City of; board of commissioners; provide staggered terms
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #744 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Vote #731 (Y: 156 N: 1 NV: 16 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Vote #731 (Y: 156 N: 1 NV: 16 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-08 | Act 516 | |
2018-05-08 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-03-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-03-14 | House | House First Readers |
2018-03-12 | House | House Hopper |