GA HB1041 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Effective Date 2023-01-01
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Effective Date 2023-01-01
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-7-29.20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to tax credits for contributions to rural hospital organizations, so as to increase the aggregate limit for tax credits for contributions to rural hospital organizations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Income tax; tax credits for contributions to rural hospital organizations; increase aggregate limit
Sponsors
Rep. Clay Pirkle [R] | Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] | Sen. Sam Watson [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] |
Rep. John Corbett [R] | Rep. Mack Jackson [D] | Sen. Billy Hickman [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #753 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Hb 424, Hb 934, Hb 997, Hb 1034, Hb 1041: Senate Vote #745 (Y: 34 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - Passage: House Vote #704 (Y: 164 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Hb 424, Hb 934, Hb 997, Hb 1034, Hb 1041: Senate Vote #745 (Y: 34 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - Passage: House Vote #704 (Y: 164 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | Effective Date 2023-01-01 | |
2022-05-06 | Act 832 | |
2022-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-15 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-15 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-02-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-01-27 | House | House First Readers |
2022-01-26 | House | House Hopper |