GA HB1041 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act incorporating the City of McDonough, approved April 16, 1981 (Ga. L. 1981, p. 3387), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 12, 2012 (Ga. L. 2012, p. 5452), so as to revise the corporate boundaries of the municipality; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
McDonough, City of; revise corporate boundaries
Sponsors
Rep. Dale Rutledge [R] | Rep. Geoff Cauble [R] | Rep. Andrew Welch [R] | Rep. Karen Mathiak [R] |
Rep. David Knight [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #692 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Vote #731 (Y: 156 N: 1 NV: 16 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Vote #731 (Y: 156 N: 1 NV: 16 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-08 | Act 515 | |
2018-05-08 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-03-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-03-15 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2018-03-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-03-12 | House | House First Readers |
2018-03-09 | House | House Hopper |