GA HB104 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 16 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the "State Properties Code," so as to clarify applicability of public bidding processes for certain conveyances; to correct cross-references; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State Properties Code; applicability of public bidding processes for certain conveyances; clarify
Sponsors
Rep. Emory Dunahoo [R] | Rep. Barbara Sims [R] | Rep. Gerald Greene [R] | Rep. Howard Maxwell [R] |
Rep. Culver Kidd [I] | Rep. Kevin Tanner [R] | Sen. Rick Jeffares [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #325 (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House Vote #41 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House Vote #41 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-06 | Act 112 | |
2015-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-02-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-02-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-02-12 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-01-29 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-01-28 | House | House First Readers |
2015-01-27 | House | House Hopper |