GA HB1037 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-7-40.26 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the "Georgia Entertainment Industry Investment Act," so as to move certain sound recordings from qualified production activities to production expenditures; to provide for definitions; to provide for rules and regulations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Georgia Entertainment Industry Investment Act; move certain sound recordings from qualified production activities to production expenditures

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-26 - House - House Vote #778 (Y: 154 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #752 (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #593 (Y: 156 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-01 Effective Date
2020-08-04 Act 559
2020-08-04HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2020-07-02HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2020-06-26HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2020-06-25SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-06-25SenateSenate Third Read
2020-06-25SenateSenate Engrossed
2020-06-25SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-06-23SenateSenate Read Second Time
2020-06-23SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-06-15SenateSenate Withdrawn & Recommitted
2020-03-13SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-03-12HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-03-12HouseHouse Third Readers
2020-03-09HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-02-28HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-02-27HouseHouse First Readers
2020-02-26HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback