GA HB1035 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to authorize the Magistrate Court of Muscogee County to impose and collect county law library fees as part of the court costs in the magistrate court; to provide for practices and procedures connected therewith; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Muscogee County; Magistrate Court to impose and collect county law library fees; authorize
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Smyre [D] | Rep. Richard Smith [R] | Rep. Carolyn Hugley [D] | Rep. Debbie Buckner [D] |
Rep. John Pezold [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #662 (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Vote #694 (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Vote #694 (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-08 | Act 512 | |
2018-05-08 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-03-14 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-14 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-12 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-03-09 | House | House First Readers |
2018-03-07 | House | House Hopper |