GA HB1034 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-8-3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to exemptions from sales and use taxes, so as to revise the exemption for sales of admissions to nonrecurring major sporting events; to amend the definition of "major sporting event" to include any match of a FIFA World Cup; to extend the sunset provision for the exemption; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sales and use tax; exemption for sales of admissions to nonrecurring major sporting events; revise
Sponsors
Rep. Marcus Wiedower [R] | Rep. Calvin Smyre [D] | Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] | Rep. Trey Rhodes [R] |
Rep. Houston Gaines [R] | Rep. David Wilkerson [D] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #752 (Y: 48 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Hb 424, Hb 934, Hb 997, Hb 1034, Hb 1041: Senate Vote #745 (Y: 34 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - Passage: House Vote #740 (Y: 155 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Hb 424, Hb 934, Hb 997, Hb 1034, Hb 1041: Senate Vote #745 (Y: 34 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - Passage: House Vote #740 (Y: 155 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Effective Date 2022-07-01 | |
2022-05-02 | Act 757 | |
2022-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-15 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-15 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-01-27 | House | House First Readers |
2022-01-26 | House | House Hopper |