GA HB1033 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-05-02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-05-02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to create the Camden County Public Service Authority, approved March 20, 1990 (Ga. L. 1990, p. 4273), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 4, 1991 (Ga. L. 1991, p. 4189), and an Act approved May 6, 2019 (Ga. L. 2019, p. 3948), so as to readopt provisions of the Act; to provide a short title; to provide for severability; to provide for legislative intent; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Camden County Public Service Authority Act; enact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #485 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #471 (Y: 115 N: 46 NV: 6 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #471 (Y: 115 N: 46 NV: 6 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Effective Date 2022-05-02 | |
2022-05-02 | Act 817 | |
2022-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-02 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2022-02-02 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-02 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-02 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-01-27 | House | House First Readers |
2022-01-26 | House | House Hopper |