GA HB1030 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-07 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act incorporating the City of Milton in Fulton County, Georgia, approved March 29, 2006 (Ga. L. 2006, p. 3554), as amended, so as to repeal a homestead exemption for citizens of the City of Milton age 65 years or older meeting certain income requirements as found in Section 6.34 of the city charter; to provide for compliance with constitutional requirements; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, a contingent effective date, and automatic repeal; to provide for applicability; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Milton, City of; repeal a homestead exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-03 - House - House Bills 1029, 1030, 1031: House Vote #476 (Y: 102 N: 64 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #471 (Y: 115 N: 46 NV: 6 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #471 (Y: 115 N: 46 NV: 6 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2022-02-03 | House | House Reconsidered |
2022-02-02 | House | House Notice to Reconsider |
2022-02-02 | House | House Third Reading Lost |
2022-02-02 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-02 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-01-27 | House | House First Readers |
2022-01-26 | House | House Hopper |