GA HB1027 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 64 of Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to regulation and licensure of pharmacy benefits managers, so as to provide for requirements relating to rebates received from pharmaceutical manufacturers; to provide for definitions; to prohibit certain activity; to provide for transparency; to prohibit public disclosure of certain information relating to rebates; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Insurance; rebates received from pharmaceutical manufacturers; provide requirements
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Hawkins [R] | Rep. Darlene Taylor [R] | Rep. Spencer Frye [D] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] |
Rep. Deborah Silcox [R] | Rep. Timothy Barr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-25 | House | House Hopper |