GA HB1027 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act entitled "An Act to provide a new charter for the City of Rincon," approved April 4, 1997 (Ga. L. 1997, p. 3556), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 15, 2005 (Ga. L. 2005, p. 3547) and an Act approved May 6, 2013 (Ga. L. 2013, p. 4259), so as to provide that the corporate limits of such town shall include certain property; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rincon, City of; corporate limits shall include certain property; provide

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-09HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-03-07HouseHouse First Readers
2018-03-05HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback