GA HB1023 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to create a Joint Board of Elections and Registration for Camden County, which shall conduct primaries and elections for Camden County, the City of St. Marys, the City of Woodbine, and the City of Kingsland, and provide for its powers and duties; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Camden County; Joint Board of Elections and Registration; create

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #637 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Vote #694 (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-01 Effective Date
2018-05-08 Act 505
2018-05-08HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-04HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-03-21SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2018-03-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-03-15SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-03-14HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-14HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-03-14HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-03-09HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-03-07HouseHouse First Readers
2018-03-05HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback