GA HB1019 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to incorporate the City of South Fulton in Fulton County, Georgia, approved April 26, 2016 (Ga. L. 2016, p. 3726), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 8, 2018 (Ga. L. 2018, p. 3910), so as to provide that the offices of mayor and councilmember are part time; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
South Fulton, City of; offices of mayor and councilmember are part time; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Bazemore [D] | Rep. Roger Bruce [D] | Rep. William Boddie [D] | Rep. Derrick Jackson [D] |
Rep. Marie Metze [D] | Sen. Donzella James [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #774 (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House Vote #492 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House Vote #492 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-30 | Act 414 | |
2020-06-30 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-26 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-02-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-02-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-25 | House | House Hopper |