GA HB1017 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-25 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-25 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 11 of Title 9 of the O.C.G.A., the "Georgia Civil Practice Act," so as to change provisions relating to general provisions governing discovery; to amend the Official Code of Georgia Annotated so as to provide for conforming cross-references to include the production of electronically stored information; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Georgia Civil Practice Act"; general provisions governing discovery; change provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Barry Fleming [R] | Rep. Wendell Willard [R] | Rep. Mary Oliver [D] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] |
Rep. Ronnie Mabra [D] | Rep. Tom Weldon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-16 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-11 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/48412 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20152016/157418 |