GA HB1014 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the imposition, rate, computation, and exemptions from state income taxes, so as to extend the sunset date of the existing exemption for donation of real property for conservation use; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Income tax; exemption for donation of real property for conservation use; extend sunset date
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #657 (Y: 38 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #670 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House Vote #666 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #670 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House Vote #666 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-28 | Act 502 | |
2016-04-28 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-02-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-16 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-11 | House | House Hopper |