GA HB1008 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 8-2-111 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to definitions relative to factory built buildings and dwelling units, so as to revise the definition of residential industrial building; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Buildings and housing; residential industrial building; revise definition
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Campbell [R] | Rep. Tom McCall [R] | Rep. John Corbett [R] | Rep. Clay Pirkle [R] |
Rep. Trey Rhodes [R] | Sen. Sam Watson [R] | Sen. Lee Anderson [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #704 (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #716 (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Vote #547 (Y: 166 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #716 (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Vote #547 (Y: 166 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-08-03 | Act 555 | |
2020-08-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Senate Third Read Tabled |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-09 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-03-09 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-03-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-25 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-24 | House | House Hopper |