GA HB10 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on December 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 2 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to competencies and core curriculum, so as to provide for instruction on the best practices for and risks associated with the use of tampons in a course of study in sex education and AIDS prevention instruction; to amend Article 1 of Chapter 1 of Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding health, so as to encourage physicians and nurses providing a tampon for use by any female patient under his or her care to recite and provide certain written information to such female patient regarding the best practices for and risks associated with the use of tampons; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Education; instruction on the best practices for and risks associated
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Bazemore [D] | Rep. Carolyn Hugley [D] | Rep. Debbie Buckner [D] | Rep. Jan Jones [R] |
Rep. Karen Bennett [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-01-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-01-16 | House | House First Readers |
2019-01-15 | House | House Hopper |
2018-12-14 | House | House Prefiled |