GA HB1 | 2018 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on November 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-17 - Act 1EX
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act making and providing appropriations for the State Fiscal Year beginning July 1, 2018, and ending June 30, 2019, known as the "General Appropriations Act," Act No. 301, approved May 2, 2018 (Ga. L. 2018, Volume One, Appendix, commencing at page 1 of 135), to make, provide, and change certain appropriations for the operation of the state government and its departments, boards, bureaus, commissions, institutions, and other agencies, for the university system, common schools, counties, municipalities, and political subdivisions, for all other governmental activities, projects, and undertakings authorized by law, and for all leases, contracts, agreements, and grants authorized by law; to provide for the control and administration of funds; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supplemental appropriations; State Fiscal Year July 1, 2018 - June 30, 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-17 - Senate - Senate Vote #10 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-11-15 - House - House Vote #4 (Y: 162 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-17 Act 1EX
2018-11-17HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-11-17HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-11-17SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2018-11-17SenateSenate Third Read
2018-11-16SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-11-16SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-11-15SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-11-15HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-11-15HouseHouse Immediately Transmitted to Senate
2018-11-15HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-11-14HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-11-14HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-11-13HouseHouse First Readers
2018-11-13HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback