GA HB1 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 51 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to torts, so as to provide for the facilitation of space flight activities in this state; to provide for definitions; to provide for exceptions; to limit the liability of space flight entities related to injuries sustained by participants who have agreed in writing to such a limitation after being provided with certain warnings; to provide a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Georgia Space Flight Act; enact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-22 - House - House Vote #295 (Y: 151 N: 6 NV: 16 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Vote #195 (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Vote #64 (Y: 162 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-01 Effective Date
2017-05-08 Act 172
2017-05-08HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-03HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2017-03-22HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2017-03-16SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-16SenateSenate Third Read
2017-03-13SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-03-10SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-17SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-16HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-02-16HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-01-31HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-01-24HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-01-23HouseHouse First Readers
2017-01-12HouseHouse Hopper
2016-11-15HouseHouse Prefiled

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback