FL S0558 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Agriculture
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing a list of raw agricultural commodities found by the Legislature to be cultivated commercially in genetically engineered form; requiring manufacturer, processor, packer, distributor, and retail food store labeling practices for genetically engineered foods by a specified date; exempting specified foods, commodities, ingredients, and other substances from the labeling requirements, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Genetically Engineered Food

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-02SenateDied in Agriculture
2014-03-04SenateIntroduced
2014-02-03SenateOn Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 02/10/14, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building --Meeting cancelled
2014-01-10SenateReferred to Agriculture; Commerce and Tourism; Regulated Industries; Community Affairs
2013-12-20SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H0001 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
50090Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback