FL S1246 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits a person from entering onto a farm and making any audio record, photograph, or video record at the farm without the owner's written consent. Provides exceptions. Provides definitions. Provides penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Farms

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-05-06 In Messages
2011-05-06 Read 3rd time -SJ 1114
2011-05-04 Read 2nd time -SJ 836
2011-05-03 Withdrawn from Budget -SJ 725
2011-04-28 Withdrawn from Criminal Justice -SJ 568
2011-03-24 Now in Criminal Justice -SJ 236
2011-03-22 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2011-03-21 CS by Agriculture; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 -SJ 236
2011-03-16 On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 03/21/11, 10:15 am, 37 Senate Office Building
2011-03-08 Introduced -SJ 92
2011-03-07 Referred to Agriculture; Criminal Justice; Budget -SJ 92
2011-02-21 Filed

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback