FL S7096 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring a compensated petition gatherer to register with the Secretary of State and to attest that he or she is a Florida resident for a specified period before obtaining signatures on petition forms; requiring the name of the sponsor of an initiative to appear on the ballot with the percentage of donations received from certain in-state donors; prohibiting compensation for initiative petition gatherers or entities based on the number of petitions gathered, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Constitutional Amendments

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Appropriations
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-11SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-09SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 5 NAYS 3
2019-04-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 04/09/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-04-03SenateIntroduced
2019-04-03SenateReferred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2019-04-02SenateFiled
2019-04-01SenateSubmitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Judiciary; YEAS 4 NAYS 2
2019-03-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/01/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-27SenateSubmitted for consideration by Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H7111 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
H5 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100371Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101161Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101171Amended CodeSee Bill Text
104186Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback