FL S7090 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-01 - Submit as committee bill by Budget (SB 2096)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the Auditor General to annually provide to the Legislature a list of school districts and water management districts that have failed to comply with certain financial transparency requirements, as identified pursuant to audit. Amends provisions relating to the Transparency Florida Act. Defines the term "department" to mean the Department of Financial Services. Removes the term "committee." Redefines the term "governmental entity" to include public schools rather than public school districts, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Financial Information

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-01 Submit as committee bill by Budget (SB 2096)
2011-03-31 On Committee agenda-- Budget, 04/02/11, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Meeting cancelled
2011-03-29 On Committee agenda-- Budget, 04/01/11, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Submitted as Committee Bill
2011-03-28 On Committee agenda-- Budget, 03/31/11, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2011-03-27 Submitted for consideration by Budget

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback