FL S7082 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7107 (Ch. 2019-166)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Adding to Schedule V of the controlled substances list certain drug products in their finished dosage formulations which are approved by the United States Food and Drug Administration, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controlled Substances

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29SenateLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7107 (Ch. 2019-166)
2019-04-29SenateSubstituted CS/HB 7107
2019-04-29SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-25SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/19
2019-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-18SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2019-04-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-04-05SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-04SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2019-04-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 04/04/19, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building
2019-03-21SenateIntroduced
2019-03-20SenateReferred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2019-03-19SenateFiled
2019-03-18SenateSubmitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2019-03-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/18/19, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2019-03-13SenateSubmitted for consideration by Criminal Justice

Same As/Similar To

H7107 (Similar To) 2019-07-01 - Chapter No. 2019-166

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
817563Amended CodeSee Bill Text
83131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89307Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89313Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback