FL S7080 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the application requirements for an operating license to conduct pari-mutuel wagering for a pari-mutuel facility; prohibiting greyhound permitholders from conducting live racing; authorizing jai alai permitholders, harness horse racing permitholders, and quarter horse racing permitholders to elect not to conduct live racing or games; specifying that certain permitholders that do not conduct live racing or games retain their permit and remain pari-mutuel facilities; revising requirements for a limited intertrack wagering license, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requirements for Pari-mutuel Permitholders to Conduct Racing or Games

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Regulated Industries (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30SenateDied on Calendar
2021-04-26SenateRemoved from Special Order Calendar, 04/26/21
2021-04-22SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2021-04-21SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2021-04-20SenateCS by Appropriations read 1st time
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/21
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-04-18SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-04-15SenateCS by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2021-04-14SenateIntroduced
2021-04-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/19/21, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-04-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/15/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-04-12SenateReferred to Appropriations
2021-04-12SenateFiled
2021-04-12SenateSubmitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Regulated Industries; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2021-04-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 04/12/21, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2021-04-07SenateSubmitted for consideration by Regulated Industries

Same As/Similar To

H7055 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died, reference deferred
H7053 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died, reference deferred
S7076 (Related) 2021-04-30 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3800651Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40282Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4800475Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5500115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55001215Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5500235Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5500351Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5500425Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550054Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55009511Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55009512Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5501155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5501647Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5501648Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550175Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5501815Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55024055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5502415Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550334Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5503551Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5503615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550475Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5505251Amended CodeSee Bill Text
550615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5506305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5506308Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
551114Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56502Amended CodeSee Bill Text
849086Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7080
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7080/BillText/pb/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7080/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7080/BillText/c1/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7080/Amendment/957796/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7080/Analyses/2021s07080.pre.ri.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7080/Analyses/2021s07080.ri.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7080/Analyses/2021s07080.pre.ap.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7080/Analyses/2021s07080.ap.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7080/Vote/2021-04-12%200300PM~S07080%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7080/Vote/2021-04-15%200900AM~S07080%20Vote%20Record.PDF

Bill Comments 750

feedback