FL S7076 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Creating the Florida Gaming Control Commission within the Office of the Attorney General; requiring the Commission on Ethics to accept and investigate any alleged violations of the standards of conduct for commissioners and employees; designating the Florida Gaming Control Commission as the state compliance agency having authority to carry out certain responsibilities; transferring all powers, duties, functions, records, offices, personnel, associated administrative support positions, property, pending issues, existing contracts, administrative authority, administrative rules, and unexpended balances of appropriations, allocations, and other funds of the Department of Business and Professional Regulation related to certain responsibilities to the commission by a type two transfer, effective on a specified date; revising the definition of the term "contraband article", etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gaming Enforcement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Regulated Industries (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30SenateDied on Calendar
2021-04-26SenateRemoved from Special Order Calendar, 04/26/21
2021-04-22SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2021-04-21SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2021-04-20SenateCS by Appropriations read 1st time
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/21/21
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-04-18SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2021-04-15SenateCS by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2021-04-14SenateIntroduced
2021-04-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/19/21, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-04-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/15/21, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-04-12SenateReferred to Appropriations
2021-04-12SenateFiled
2021-04-12SenateSubmitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Regulated Industries; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2021-04-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 04/12/21, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2021-04-07SenateSubmitted for consideration by Regulated Industries

Same As/Similar To

S7078 (Related) 2021-04-30 - Died on Calendar
H7053 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died, reference deferred
H7055 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died, reference deferred
H7057 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died, reference deferred
S7080 (Related) 2021-04-30 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1656Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1671Amended CodeSee Bill Text
16712Amended CodeSee Bill Text
16715Amended CodeSee Bill Text
285710Amended CodeSee Bill Text
932701Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7076
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7076/BillText/pb/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7076/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7076/BillText/c1/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7076/Amendment/848350/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7076/Amendment/940328/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7076/Analyses/2021s07076.pre.ri.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7076/Analyses/2021s07076.ri.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7076/Analyses/2021s07076.pre.ap.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7076/Analyses/2021s07076.ap.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7076/Vote/2021-04-12%200300PM~S07076%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7076/Vote/2021-04-15%200900AM~S07076%20Vote%20Record.PDF

Bill Comments 750

feedback