FL S7058 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7095
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Adopting the 2020 version of the Internal Revenue Code for purposes of the state corporate income tax code; providing for retroactive operation, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Internal Revenue Code

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10SenateLaid on Table, refer to HB 7095
2020-03-10SenateSubstituted HB 7095
2020-03-10SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-06SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/20
2020-02-28SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-02-27SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2020-02-24SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/20, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2020-02-19SenateIntroduced
2020-02-19SenateReferred to Appropriations
2020-02-19SenateFiled
2020-02-18SenateSubmitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Finance and Tax; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2020-02-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 02/18/20, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Building
2020-02-13SenateSubmitted for consideration by Finance and Tax

Same As/Similar To

H7095 (Similar To) 2020-09-21 - Chapter No. 2020-184

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22003Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback