FL S7058 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the Administrative Trust Fund within the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles; providing for the purpose of the trust fund and sources of funds; providing for future review and termination or re-creation of the trust fund, etc.
Title
Trust Funds/Administrative Trust Fund/Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#10 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Messages |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-07 | House | In Messages |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/07/19 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/21/19, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Appropriations |