FL S7056 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Chapter No. 2021-5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Chapter No. 2021-5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Terminating the Public Defenders Revenue Trust Fund within the Justice Administrative Commission; repealing provisions relating to the Public Defenders Revenue Trust Fund; terminating the Welfare Transition Trust Fund within the Department of Military Affairs; terminating the Welfare Transition Trust Fund within the Department of Health, etc.
Title
Trust Funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#78 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | Chapter No. 2021-5 | |
2021-04-19 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-04-13 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2021-04-08 | House | Message sent to senate |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2021-04-08 | House | Immediately certified |
2021-04-08 | House | Passed; YEAS 117, NAYS 0 |
2021-04-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-07 | House | Added to Third Reading Calendar |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2021-04-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-07 | House | Substituted for HB 5009 |
2021-04-01 | House | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) |
2021-04-01 | House | Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/7/2021) |
2021-04-01 | House | Bill referred to House Calendar |
2021-03-25 | House | In Messages |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Immediately certified |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/25/21 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/04/21, 11:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
H5009 (Same As) 2021-04-07 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 7056 (Ch. 2021-5), SB 2500 (Ch. 2021-36)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 435 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
250 | 175 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
27 | 61 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
817 | 568 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |