FL S7054 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the organization of the Department of Transportation; revising uses for distributions made under the State Transportation Trust Fund in specified fiscal years; deleting the scheduled expiration of funding for the Intermodal Logistics Center Infrastructure Support Program; requiring airport protection zoning regulations to require certain permit applicants to submit a final valid determination from the Federal Aviation Administration, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Appropriations
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-02-27SenateNow in Appropriations
2020-02-25SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2020-02-20SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 02/25/20, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-02-12SenateIntroduced
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2020-02-11SenateFiled
2020-02-10SenateSubmitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2020-02-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 02/10/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-02-05SenateSubmitted for consideration by Infrastructure and Security

Same As/Similar To

H519 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
H1315 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
S1766 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
H395 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
S410 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Vetoed by Governor

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20646Amended CodeSee Bill Text
206606Amended CodeSee Bill Text
206608Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2120501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2880656Amended CodeSee Bill Text
311101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31932Amended CodeSee Bill Text
33303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
334275Amended CodeSee Bill Text
33725Amended CodeSee Bill Text
33908Amended CodeSee Bill Text
339135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
339175Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3392821Amended CodeSee Bill Text
341302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
341303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3418201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3418203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
341822Amended CodeSee Bill Text
341825Amended CodeSee Bill Text
341836Amended CodeSee Bill Text
341838Amended CodeSee Bill Text
341839Amended CodeSee Bill Text
341840Amended CodeSee Bill Text
34358Amended CodeSee Bill Text
377809Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback