FL S7052 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Providing term limits for the Public Counsel; providing an exception for time served before a specified date; providing for the appointment and removal of the Public Counsel; requiring the Committee on Public Counsel Oversight to receive applications, conduct interviews, and appoint a Public Counsel by a specified date every 4 years, etc.
Title
Office of Public Counsel
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died on Calendar |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (197538) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 10 NAYS 7 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/02/20, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-02-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/20, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Filed |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Innovation, Industry, and Technology; YEAS 6 NAYS 3 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 02/10/20, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Innovation, Industry, and Technology |
Same As/Similar To
H1095 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-137