FL S7048 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creating an exemption from public records requirements for the name, address, and telephone number of a person which are held by an agency providing shelter or assistance to such person during an emergency; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records/Public Shelter Space

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#16 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Messages
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-03-06HouseIn Messages
2020-03-06SenatePassed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2020-03-06SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-05SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-03SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/20
2020-03-03SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-02SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2020-02-26SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/02/20, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-02-21SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/20, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building --Not Considered
2020-02-17SenateNow in Rules
2020-02-17SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2020-02-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/17/20, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
2020-02-12SenateIntroduced
2020-02-07SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2020-02-05SenateFiled
2020-02-03SenateSubmitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2020-01-29SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 02/03/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-29SenateSubmitted for consideration by Infrastructure and Security

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
252385Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback