FL S7048 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring service providers to disclose information from a clinical record under certain circumstances relating to threats to cause seriously bodily injury or death; requiring, rather than authorizing, psychiatrists to disclose certain patient communications for purposes of notifying potential victims and law enforcement agencies of certain threats; requiring, rather than authorizing, psychologists to disclose certain patient and client communications for purposes of notifying potential victims and law enforcement agencies of certain threats; providing psychologists with immunity from specified liability and actions under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disclosure of Confidential Records

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#7 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseDied in Messages
2019-05-03HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-23HouseIn Messages
2019-04-23SenatePassed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 407
2019-04-23SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-17SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-17SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-15SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-10SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2019-04-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/10/19, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-21SenateNow in Rules
2019-03-20SenateFavorable by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2019-03-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 03/20/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-02-28SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Rules
2019-02-20SenateFiled
2019-02-19SenateSubmitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2019-02-12SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/19/19, 12:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-02-12SenateSubmitted for consideration by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs

Same As/Similar To

S1418 (Similar To) 2019-06-14 - Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
H361 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3944615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456059Amended CodeSee Bill Text
490009Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4900147Amended CodeSee Bill Text
491009Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4910147Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback