FL S7042 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7035 (Ch. 2023-76)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-03 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7035 (Ch. 2023-76)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amending a provision which provides an exemption from public record and public meeting requirements for certain data and information relating to cybersecurity; repealing exemptions relating to data and information from technology systems; revising specified information that is required to be made available to certain entities; removing the scheduled repeal of the exemption, etc.
Title
OGSR/Citizens Property Insurance Corporation/Cybersecurity Data and Information
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7035 (Ch. 2023-76) |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Substituted HB 7035 |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/03/23 |
2023-04-25 | Senate | CS by Rules read 1st time |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2023-04-19 | Senate | CS by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2023-04-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/19/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building |
2023-04-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/11/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Introduced |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2023-03-17 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/22/23, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Banking and Insurance |
Same As/Similar To
H7035 (Similar To) 2023-05-12 - Chapter No. 2023-76