FL S7040 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7021 (Ch. 2019-97), CS/HB 7023 (Ch. 2019-40)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7021 (Ch. 2019-97), CS/HB 7023 (Ch. 2019-40)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Commission on Ethics to procure and test an electronic filing system by a certain date; requiring certain forms to be filed electronically beginning on a specified date; providing that the commission is not liable for the release of certain information under certain circumstances; requiring the commission to redact certain information under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Financial Disclosure
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability Committee | Senate Ethics and Elections Committee |
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#6 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7021 (Ch. 2019-97), CS/HB 7023 (Ch. 2019-40) |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 7021 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-16 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/17/19 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-04-11 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/11/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2019-04-02 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-03-26 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/26/19, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 02/13/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Ethics and Elections |
Same As/Similar To
S7042 (Related) 2019-04-24 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7023 (Ch. 2019-40), CS/HB 7021 (Ch. 2019-97)
H7021 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-97, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7023 (Ch. 2019-40), CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169)
H7023 (Similar To) 2019-05-15 - Chapter No. 2019-40, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7021 (Ch. 2019-97)
H7021 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-97, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7023 (Ch. 2019-40), CS/CS/CS/HB 385 (Ch. 2019-169)
H7023 (Similar To) 2019-05-15 - Chapter No. 2019-40, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7021 (Ch. 2019-97)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
112 | 312 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3144 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 31446 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 31455 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |