FL S7022 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - Chapter No. 2023-61
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amending a provision which provides an exemption from public meetings requirements for any portion of a meeting of the Marjory Stoneman Douglas High School Safety Commission at which exempt or confidential and exempt information is discussed; removing the scheduled repeal of the exemption; amending a provision relating to an exemption from public records requirements for information held by specified entities which could identify a safe-school officer; removing the scheduled repeal of the exemption, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

OGSR/Marjory Stoneman Douglas High School Public Safety Commission/Safe-school Officers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-02 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#408 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#5 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Education Pre-K -12 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-12 Chapter No. 2023-61
2023-05-11 Approved by Governor
2023-05-09 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2023-05-02SenateOrdered enrolled
2023-05-02HousePassed; YEAS 117, NAYS 0
2023-05-02HouseRead 3rd time
2023-05-01HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2023-05-01HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2023-05-01HouseRead 2nd time
2023-04-28House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2023-04-28HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (5/1/2023)
2023-04-28HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2023-04-19HouseIn Messages
2023-04-18SenatePassed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2023-04-18SenateRead 3rd time
2023-04-18SenateRead 2nd time
2023-04-13SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/18/23
2023-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2023-04-11SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2023-04-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/11/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
2023-03-29SenateNow in Rules
2023-03-29SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2023-03-24SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/29/23, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building
2023-03-21SenateIntroduced
2023-03-16SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2023-03-15SenateFiled
2023-03-14SenateSubmitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Education Pre-K -12; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2023-03-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K -12, 03/14/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
2023-03-09SenateSubmitted for consideration by Education Pre-K -12

Same As/Similar To

H7029 (Same As) 2023-05-01 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 7022 (Ch. 2023-61)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100612Amended CodeSee Bill Text
943687Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/7022
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/7022/BillText/pb/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/7022/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/7022/BillText/er/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/7022/Analyses/2023s07022.pre.ed.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/7022/Analyses/2023s07022.ed.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/7022/Analyses/2023s07022.pre.go.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/7022/Analyses/2023s07022.go.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/7022/Analyses/2023s07022.pre.rc.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/7022/Analyses/2023s07022.rc.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/7022/Vote/2023-03-14%200830AM~S07022%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/7022/Vote/2023-03-29%200830AM~S07022%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/7022/Vote/2023-04-11%200830AM~S07022%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/7022/Vote/SenateVote_s07022__005.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2023/7022/Vote/HouseVote_s07022__408.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback