FL S7022 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7001
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amending a provision which provides an exemption from public records requirements for certain e-mail addresses collected by the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles; removing the scheduled repeal of the exemption, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

OGSR/E-mail Addresses/Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19SenateLaid on Table, refer to HB 7001
2020-02-19SenateSubstituted HB 7001
2020-02-19SenateRead 2nd time
2020-02-17SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/19/20
2020-02-05SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-02-05SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 1
2020-01-31SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/05/20, 9:30 am, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-21SenateNow in Rules
2020-01-21SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2020-01-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/21/20, 2:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-12-18SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2019-12-10SenateFiled
2019-12-09SenateSubmitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2019-12-02SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 12/09/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-12-02SenateSubmitted for consideration by Infrastructure and Security

Same As/Similar To

H7001 (Same As) 2020-06-19 - Chapter No. 2020-48
S1030 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1190712Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback