FL S7020 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-01-19 - In Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amending a provision which provides an exemption from public records requirements for certain information held by the Office of Financial Regulation relating to affiliated international trust entities; removing the scheduled repeal of the exemption; amending a provision which provides an exemption from public records requirements for certain information held by the office relating to qualified limited service affiliates; removing the scheduled repeal of the exemption; amending a provision which provides exemptions from public records requirements for certain information held by the office relating to active investigations of and the regulation of financial institutions; removing the scheduled repeal of the exemption, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

OGSR/Office of Financial Regulation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#18 (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-12-01 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-19HouseIn Messages
2022-01-19SenateImmediately certified
2022-01-19SenatePassed; YEAS 33 NAYS 2
2022-01-19SenateRead 3rd time
2022-01-19SenateRead 2nd time
2022-01-13SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 01/19/22
2022-01-13SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2022-01-13SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 14 NAYS 1
2022-01-11SenateIntroduced
2022-01-10SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/13/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2022-01-05SenateReferred to Rules
2021-12-02SenateFiled
2021-12-01SenateSubmitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2021-11-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 12/01/21, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-11-22SenateSubmitted for consideration by Banking and Insurance

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
655057Amended CodeSee Bill Text
663416Amended CodeSee Bill Text
663540Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/7020
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/7020/BillText/pb/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/7020/BillText/Filed/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/7020/Analyses/2022s07020.pre.bi.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/7020/Analyses/2022s07020.bi.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/7020/Analyses/2022s07020.pre.rc.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/7020/Analyses/2022s07020.rc.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/7020/Vote/2021-12-01%200830AM~S07020%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/7020/Vote/2022-01-13%200900AM~S07020%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2022/7020/Vote/SenateVote_s07020__018.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback