FL S7020 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing the Department of Transportation to plan, design, and construct staging areas as part of the turnpike system for the intended purpose of staging supplies for prompt provision of assistance to the public in a declared state of emergency; requiring the department, in consultation with the Division of Emergency Management, to select sites for such areas; requiring the department to give priority consideration to placement of such staging areas in specified counties, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency Staging Areas

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#13 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Messages
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-03-06HouseIn Messages
2020-03-06SenatePassed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2020-03-06SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-05SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-03SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/20
2020-02-21SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-02-20SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2020-02-17SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/20/20, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2020-01-29SenateNow in Appropriations
2020-01-29SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2020-01-24SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, 01/29/20, 11:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-12-18SenateReferred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2019-12-10SenateFiled
2019-12-09SenateSubmitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2019-12-02SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 12/09/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-12-02SenateSubmitted for consideration by Infrastructure and Security

Same As/Similar To

S7018 (Similar To) 2020-06-10 - Chapter No. 2020-21
H395 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
338236Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback