FL S7016 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing the office within the Executive Office of the Governor; creating the Statewide Sea-Level Rise Task Force within the office; authorizing the Department of Environmental Protection to contract for specified services, upon request of the task force; requiring the Environmental Regulation Commission to take certain action on the task force's recommendations, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Statewide Office of Resiliency

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#20 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Messages
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-03-06HouseIn Messages
2020-03-06SenatePassed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2020-03-06SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-05SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-03SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/20
2020-02-06SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-02-05SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2020-02-03SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/06/20, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Meeting cancelled
2020-01-31SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/05/20, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2020-01-17SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 01/23/20, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-13SenateNow in Appropriations
2020-01-13SenateFavorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2020-01-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 01/13/20, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2019-12-18SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations
2019-12-10SenateFiled
2019-12-09SenateSubmitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2019-12-02SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 12/09/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-12-02SenateSubmitted for consideration by Infrastructure and Security

Same As/Similar To

S178 (Related) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-119
H579 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 178 passed
H1073 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in State Affairs Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
142031Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback