FL S7008 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7047 (Ch. 2019-32)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7047 (Ch. 2019-32)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amending provisions which provides a public records exemption for information received by the Department of Legal Affairs pursuant to a notification of a security breach or during the course of an investigation of such breach; removing the scheduled repeal of the exemption, etc.
Title
OGSR/Security Breach Information/Department of Legal Affairs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7047 (Ch. 2019-32) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Substituted HB 7047 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/19 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/13/19, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/19/19, 2:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2019-01-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/22/19, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H7047 (Same As) 2019-05-15 - Chapter No. 2019-32