FL S7000 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amending provisions relating to an exemption from the public records requirements for personal identifying information contained in dental workforce surveys held by the Department of Health; removing the scheduled repeal of the exemption, etc.
Title
OGSR/Dental Workforce Surveys/Department of Health
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-07 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/12/19, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2018-12-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/07/19, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2018-12-20 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Health Policy |