FL S2784 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1631 (Ch. 2010-273)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1631 (Ch. 2010-273)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends chapter 2006-317, Laws of Florida. Corrects the legal description of the boundaries of the district.
Title
Lake Padgett Estates/Pasco County
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Rules, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1631 (Ch. 2010-273) | |
2010-04-26 | Introduced -SJ 00864; Referred to Rules -SJ 00864 | |
2010-03-12 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1631 (Similar To) 2010-06-11 - Chapter No. 2010-273